judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAMPTON G. JOYNER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0988
Short Caption:HAMPTON G. JOYNER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F732-88Filed Date:08/04/1988

Opening Event Date:08/04/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/23/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/23/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/11/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/02/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHampton G. Joyner N
Warren GormanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Ronald C. Crump YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOYNER, HAMPTON G. UNITED STATES
08/04/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WARREN E. GORMAN, ESQ . PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 082688 SCHPRD DSA
11/01/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD R
11/23/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/23/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(142 PGS/PIRFO) AD PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
12/19/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD BA
01/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-23-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD BE
02/22/1989ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF ON OR BEF 2/23/89 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 021089 SCHPRD N
02/23/1989FiledBriefing Completed
02/23/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 022389 SCHPRD BE
07/11/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/11/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF TRIAL COURT JUDGMENT PANELMKBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/02/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD