Case Information: 46780 | |||
Short Caption: | MCNAIR (KIMBLE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C082255 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/05/2006 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/15/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/15/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 06-03355 | |
03/01/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. | 06-04644 | |
05/05/2006 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 - 28. | 06-09459 | |
05/05/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/30/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn10[We have received all proper person documents and conclude that no relief is warranted. The Honorable Miriam Shearing, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under general orders of assignment entered January 6, 2006.] NNP-SR-MD/RP/MS | 06-13544 | |
07/26/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-14499 | |
07/26/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/02/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 28, 2006. | 06-14499 |