judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEPHEN STEWART V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0884
Short Caption:STEPHEN STEWART V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-18439-09Filed Date:07/14/2010

Opening Event Date:07/14/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/12/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/30/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/29/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/28/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStephen Stewart YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/27/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Regina Michaels, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/27/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Regina Michaels, Esquire
08/18/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
10/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (420 pgs/Janifer) 3/29-4/1/10 proc. cd attached
10/12/2010RECORD INDEX
10/12/2010RECORD COPIES
10/12/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (SEALED pleadings)
10/12/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/23/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until January 28, 2011 (no oppo)
12/02/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 28, 2011. (JAC)
01/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until February 28, 2011 (unopposed)
02/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 28, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
03/01/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/01/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
03/30/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/30/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/08/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
04/20/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/29/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Thompson, Ruiz, Newman
10/06/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson, Associate Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
10/28/2011FiledMandate
11/18/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)