Case Information: 34781 | |||
Short Caption: | PEOT (MARNIE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 33393 , 35632 , 44272 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C121163 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Becker | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Maupin for Justice Becker | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/03/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/07/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
09/07/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-08361 | |
09/07/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
10/07/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34767, 34781, 34799, 34803. | 99-09641 | |
02/03/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 20. Mailed on 01/26/00. | 00-01763 | |
02/03/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/09/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court affirmed.' SNP01A-WM/CY/ML | 01-11528 | |
08/06/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-11610 | |
08/06/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/27/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. | 01-11610 |