judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MORGAN, PHILIP I. AMERICAN UNIVERSITY

Case Information: 86-CV-0378
Short Caption:MORGAN, PHILIP I. AMERICAN UNIVERSITYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA10493-83Filed Date:02/28/1986

Opening Event Date:02/28/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/16/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/26/1986
Argued/Submitted:02/04/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John M. Clifford YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Benjamin P. Lamberton YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Anthony C. Morella NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MORGAN, PHILIP I. AMERICAN UNIVERSITY
02/28/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/16/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/26/1986FiledBriefing Completed
02/04/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/30/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition