judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DYMON INVESTMENTS VS. LAS VEGAS VALLEY HOLDING

Case Information: 46762
Short Caption:DYMON INVESTMENTS VS. LAS VEGAS VALLEY HOLDINGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A493184Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/17/2006 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/19/2007How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/14/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Rawlings Olson Cannon Gormley & Desruisseaux--check no. 88529.
02/14/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-03286
02/17/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/02/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-04710
03/07/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing for Docketing Statement served upon Settlement Judge William Buchanan. 06-05007
03/23/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 18, 2006. 06-06203
04/19/2006MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal, or in the Alternative, to Expedite Appeal, Remove Case from the Settlement Program and to Require Adequate Security. 06-08215
04/21/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. 06-08514
04/27/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-08957
05/01/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Expedite Appeal, Remove Case from the Settlement Program and to Require Adequate Security. 06-09072
05/03/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Stayed. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. The settlement proceedings are concluded and this appeal may proceed. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 9(a) shall remain suspended pending further order of this court upon resolution of respondents' motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. 06-09317
08/17/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Resolving Motion or Stipulation. And Remanding for Entry of Written Findings on the Adequacy of Security to Stay Execution of Judgment. We deny the portion of Welch and Notario's motion to remove this appeal from the settlement program as moot. We deny Welch and Notario's motion to the extent it seeks dismissal of this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. fn4[We deny Welch and Notario's request for attorney fees as a sanction.] We remand this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of entering a written order that sets forth 'specific and substantial reasons' for its decision to not require appellants to post a full supersedes bond and to substitute alternate security. Certified district court order due: 35 days. We grant Welch and Notario's motion to the extent that it requests this court to expedite this appeal. This court shall expedite this appeal to the extent that this court's docket permits. When briefing and compliance with NRAP 9(a) are reinstated, no extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 06-17161
09/22/2006Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on September 18, 2006 (submitted in response to August 17, 2006 order). 06-19511
10/13/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. for Adequate Security and Reinstating Briefing. We deny Welch and Notario's motion to require "adequate security." We now reinstate briefing and the requesting of transcripts. Transcript request due: 10 days. In accordance with our August 17, 2006, order, briefing shall proceed on an expedited basis. Opening brief and appendix due: 60 days. Respondents shall have 20 days from service of appellants' opening brief to file and serve their answering briefs. Appellants shall have 20 days from service of the answering briefs to file and serve their reply brief. No extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 06-21107
10/25/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/06/05, 04/18/05, 07/20/05, 08/11/05, 08/22/05, 10/27/05, 12/21/05, 01/26/05, 02/13/06, 03/13/06, and 05/01/06. To Court Reporter: Paula Walsh, Dick Kangas, and Rachelle Hamilton. 06-21917
11/13/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/18/05 & 3/13/06. Court Reporter: Paula Walsh. 06-23165
11/13/2006Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Paula Walsh regarding transcripts. 06-23199
12/12/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-25368
12/12/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 5. 06-25371
12/29/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] No court recorder is obligated to file transcripts for April 6, 2005, August 22, 2005, December 21, 2005, or May 1, 2006. If appellants believe this court should review these transcripts for July 20, 2005, August 11, 2005, October 27, 2005, or January 26, 2006, they should include them in the appendix to the opening brief. No court recorder is obligated to file these transcripts. It appears that the February 13, 2006, transcript may have been improperly requested, and no court recorder is obligated to file it in this court. If appellants believe it is appropriate for this court to consider this transcript, they may include a copy of it in the appendix to their opening brief. We direct appellants' counsel to pay the required deposit immediately, if he has not already done so. We caution that failure to do so in the future may result in the imposition of sanctions. 06-26630
01/08/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-00540
01/18/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering brief due: January 19, 2007. Any additional extensions will be granted only on showing of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 07-01283
01/22/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Motion 07-01570
01/26/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to file Answering Brief. Respondents shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file the answering brief. We expect no further motions to extend the time to file the answering brief. 07-02087
02/05/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-02843
02/26/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. 07-04478
04/19/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 07-08737
04/19/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/04/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order." fn2[We decline respondents' request to impose sanctions.] NNP07-JH/RP/MD 07-09929
05/29/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-11373
05/29/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/07/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2007. 07-11373