judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARTER JR., KIRK R. DC DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICE

Case Information: 86-CV-0461
Short Caption:CARTER JR., KIRK R. DC DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:MPA16-84Filed Date:03/10/1986

Opening Event Date:03/10/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/18/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/16/1987
Argued/Submitted:12/01/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Alan Banov YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Donna M. MuraskyYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CARTER JR., KIRK R. DC DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICE
03/10/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/18/1986FiledRecord Completed
06/16/1987FiledBriefing Completed
12/01/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/21/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition