judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ONTELL, DAVID J. CAPITOL HILL E.W. LIMITED

Case Information: 86-CV-0472
Short Caption:ONTELL, DAVID J. CAPITOL HILL E.W. LIMITEDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LT66636-85Filed Date:03/25/1986

Opening Event Date:03/25/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/18/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/22/1986
Argued/Submitted:02/02/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid J. Ontell NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Robert F. Leibner YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ONTELL, DAVID J. CAPITOL HILL E.W. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
03/25/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/18/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/22/1986FiledBriefing Completed
02/02/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/09/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition