Case Information: 46757 | |||
Short Caption: | MCMILLAN VS. ANDERSON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A508520 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/07/2006 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Todd J. McMillan--check no. 2510. | ||
02/09/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 06-02985 | |
03/02/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 06-04729 | |
03/22/2006 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 06-06085 | |
04/25/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. A508520: 120 days. | 06-08684 | |
08/07/2006 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. | 06-16301 | |
08/07/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/16/2006 | Other | Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 08/16/06 addressed to Todd McMillan returned. No forwarding address. | ||
01/04/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why his appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. Failure to respond to this order will result in this court's dismissal of this appeal. | 07-00263 | |
01/17/2007 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 01/04/07 addressed to Todd McMillan returned. No forwarding address. | ||
02/08/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal." NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-03284 | |
02/14/2007 | Other | Returned Mail. Order Dismissing Appeal, addressed to Todd McMillan returned. No forwarding address. | ||
03/07/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-04890 | |
03/07/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/13/2007 | Other | Returned Mail. Remittitur addressed to Todd McMillan returned. No forwarding address. | ||
03/20/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 12, 2007. | 07-04890 |