Case: 01-03-01322-CR
01-03-01322-CR
12/18/2003
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Justin Grubbs
The State of Texas
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/16/2005 | Date final opinion release for publication | | |||
11/21/2005 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |||
10/24/2005 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |||
09/14/2005 | Petition for discretionary review disposed | CCA refuses petition for discretionary review | | ||
05/16/2005 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |||
05/12/2005 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |||
04/18/2005 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |||
04/01/2005 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |||
03/17/2005 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
11/09/2004 | Submitted | | |||
10/15/2004 | Submission | | |||
06/10/2004 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||
05/23/2004 | Brief Due | | |||
05/20/2004 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/20/2004 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |||
04/23/2004 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |||
04/23/2004 | Brief Due | | |||
03/24/2004 | Extension Granted - No Further Extensions Of Time Will be Entertained | Grant motion | | ||
03/24/2004 | Brief Due | | |||
03/18/2004 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |||
02/23/2004 | Reporter's record filed (statement of facts) | | |||
02/23/2004 | Ext of Time Rpt Rec Disp. - Record is here | Grant motion | | ||
02/09/2004 | Request filed for additional time to file reporter's record | | |||
02/09/2004 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |||
02/03/2004 | Record due | | |||
12/18/2003 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |||
12/12/2003 | Notice of appeal filed | | |||
12/05/2003 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/21/2005 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Charles A. Rosenthal, Jr. Lori Deangelo Fix |
Grubbs, Justin | Appellant | Josh Schaffer |
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 4
Harris
Honorable Hon. James E. Anderson
1194241