Case Information: 46754 | |||
Short Caption: | TINER (BRUCE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52999 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Eureka Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR945 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/03/2006 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/09/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 06-02893 | |
02/13/2006 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed in district court on February 9, 2006. | 06-03182 | |
02/21/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. | 06-03797 | |
04/03/2006 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 11. (Volumes 1-5-District Court No. CR945; Volume 6-District Court No. 3483; Volumes 7 and 8-District Court No. HC 0204-0009; Volume 9-District Court No. CV0401-037; Volume 10-Opening Brief/Appendix/Answering Brief filed in the Supreme Court; Volume 11-Presentence Investiation-SEALED. | 06-06978 | |
04/03/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/21/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-RR/MD/RP | 06-08440 | |
06/07/2006 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[To the extent that appellant sought en banc reconsideration, appellant's motion is premature.] NNP06R-RR/MD/RP | 06-11960 | |
07/05/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-11984 | |
07/05/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/12/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 10, 2006. | 06-11984 |