judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BOYLE, DONALD AMERICAN SECURITY BANK

Case Information: 86-CV-0455
Short Caption:BOYLE, DONALD AMERICAN SECURITY BANKClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA10697-83Filed Date:03/05/1986

Opening Event Date:03/05/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/05/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/17/1987
Argued/Submitted:07/14/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Stephen O. HesslerYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
James E. Tompert YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BOYLE, DONALD ET AL AMERICAN SECURITY BANK
03/05/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/05/1986FiledRecord Completed
02/17/1987FiledBriefing Completed
07/14/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/15/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition