Case Information: 46747 | |||
Short Caption: | CORTNER (DAVID) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46913 , 46928 , 47087 , 49991 , 53992 , 53993 , 55299 , 57768 , 58297 , 61105 , 62131 , 66701 , 66701-COA , 69760 , 76937 , 77521 , 77521-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR042871 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/08/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/08/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 06-02813 | |
03/07/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 06-04971 | |
04/04/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-05086 | |
04/04/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/17/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 10, 2006. | 06-05086 |