Case Information: 46748 | |||
Short Caption: | GARCIA (TODD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFP041469 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/08/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/08/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 06-02818 | |
02/08/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: January 20, 2006. Court Reporter: Liz Fetterman. Filed in district court on: February 3, 2006. | 06-02819 | |
02/10/2006 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 1/20/06. Court Reporter: Liz Fetterman | 06-03042 | |
03/22/2006 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 27, 2006. | 06-06064 | |
03/27/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 06-06399 | |
03/27/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 06-06400 | |
03/31/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 06-06838 | |
05/22/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-10685 | |
06/16/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-10960 | |
06/16/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/22/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 20, 2006. | 06-10960 |