judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD M. HAYNES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0072
Short Caption:RONALD M. HAYNES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1346-85Filed Date:01/06/1987

Opening Event Date:01/06/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/13/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/24/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/01/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/29/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald M. Haynes N
Thomas M. Slawson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ronald C. Crump YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAYNES, RONALD M. UNITED STATES
01/06/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/06/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB NO SLIP SENT - ATTY APPT?) PANEL SCDATE 030987 SCHPRD R
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS M. SLAWSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
11/13/1987FiledRecord Completed
11/13/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (279 PGS - HART) JB PANEL SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD RT
12/15/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/29/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/30/88 MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 011988 SCHPRD BE
05/31/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 053188 SCHPRD BE
06/01/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED BRIEF RJG (PB) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S CORRECTED BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/24/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF (CORRECTED BRIEF) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/01/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1988SUBMITTED PANELFESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/29/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD