judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARLTON WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1035
Short Caption:CARLTON WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10230-87Filed Date:08/09/1988

Opening Event Date:08/09/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/12/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/05/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/06/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/11/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarlton Williams N
Gretchen FranklinYY
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia Stewart YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, CARLTON UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 3/5/90 ORD: GRT STIP AND MO NOTE - 01 TO FILE BRF AND CLK OF SUP CT NOTE - 02 SHALL TRANSMIT TO THIS COURT NOTE - 02 (DEFENDANT'S EXH #11 AND NOTE - 03 DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED INSTRUCT. NOTE - 03 CONCERNING SELF-DEFENSE) AS A NOTE - 04 SUPPL RECORD FORTHWITH. FO NOTE - 04 THAT THE CLK OF THIS COURT NOTE - 05 SHALL FILE THE LODGED BRF OF NOTE - 05 APLE AND SHALL SCHD THIS CASE NOTE - 06 FOR CONSIDERATION AS SOON AS NOTE - 06 THE CALENDAR PERMITS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/06/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - FRANKLING FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - STEWARTP FOR - APPELLEE
08/09/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/24/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING THE TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD DSA
11/08/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD R
01/30/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(140 PGS/HART) AD PANEL SCDATE 112988 SCHPRD RT
04/12/1989FiledRecord Completed
04/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (667 PGS. -- PAVLISH) RJG PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/27/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 5TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 090589 SCHPRD BA
09/21/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE BRF ON OR BEFORE 10/5/89 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD N
10/05/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 100589 SCHPRD BA
10/05/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION STIPULATION OF PARTIES TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 7, 1989 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 110989 SCHPRD BE
12/07/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 18, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DEC. 22, 1989 NO OPA AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989RECEIVED APLE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(11 PGS/WRAY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/05/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 6 SL PANELRO SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD N
03/08/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(EXHIBIT BIG-BOARD-MAP) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED IN- STRUCTIONS CONCERNING SELF- DEFENSE) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FL RBA. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD VS
05/29/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/06/1990ARGUED PANELRGNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/11/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD