Case Information: 46792 | |||
Short Caption: | MCCOY ( LEON) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43145 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C195950 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/18/2006 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/16/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/16/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 06-03564 | |
03/24/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. | 06-06297 | |
05/18/2006 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. | 06-10458 | |
05/18/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/25/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-15416 | |
08/22/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-16622 | |
08/22/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/31/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 24, 2006. | 06-16622 |