judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAFOREST L. DUPREE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0990
Short Caption:LAFOREST L. DUPREE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11500-87Filed Date:07/28/1988

Opening Event Date:07/28/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/08/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/18/1989
Argued/Submitted:10/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/03/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLaforest L. Dupree N
James C. Savage YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Jock A. Banks YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DUPREE, LAFOREST L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ANDREW F. WILLIAMS, JR. NOTE - 01 & DANNIEL L. SLAYTON
07/28/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JAMES C. SAVAGE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 082688 SCHPRD DSA
11/08/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/08/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 092788 SCHPRD R
12/16/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BA
01/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-15-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD BE
01/25/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 2/15/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD V
02/15/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/17/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 021589 SCHPRD BE
02/21/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/17/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD X
03/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 18TH JB PANEL SCDATE 031789 SCHPRD BE
04/14/1989ORDER GRT APLE'S MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRF PROVIDED THE BRF IS FILED ON OR BEFORE 4/18/89 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 032989 SCHPRD OPA
04/18/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/18/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 041889 SCHPRD BE
10/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/12/1989SUBMITTED PANELTESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF ORDER APPEALED FROM PANELTESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/03/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD