judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHNSON, OLIVIA PHIFER, EUGENE H.

Case Information: 86-CV-0476
Short Caption:JOHNSON, OLIVIA PHIFER, EUGENE H.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LT11227-84Filed Date:03/24/1986

Opening Event Date:03/24/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/13/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/13/1986
Argued/Submitted:11/24/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOlivia Johnson NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Phillip L. Felts YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, OLIVIA PHIFER, EUGENE H. ET AL.
03/24/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/13/1986FiledRecord Completed
08/13/1986FiledBriefing Completed
11/24/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/02/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition