judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITFIELD (RONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46765
Short Caption:WHITFIELD (RONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C213616Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:CherryCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice CherryPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/14/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/14/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-03294
02/17/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Redesignation of Appeal/Fast Track. Upon further review, it has been determined that this is a Fast Track appeal.
02/24/2006Other Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 02/14/06 addressed to Ronald Whitfield returned. No forwarding address.
03/02/2006Other Returned Mail. Notice issued 02/17/06 addressed to Ronald Whitfield returned. No forwarding address.
03/08/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Clark County Public Defender's Notice that James Buchanan is Counsel of Record for Defendant and Notice of Appeal is Premature. 06-05127
03/17/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On March 8, 2006, Howard Brooks of the Clark County Public Defender's Office filed a notice that this court construes as a motion to withdraw as counsel. The motion is granted. Buchanan shall fulfill the obligations of trial counsel pursuant to NRAP 3C. The deadlines for the filing of documents will begin to run upon the entry of the judgment of conviction. 06-05827
04/26/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Copy of Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on April 4, 2006. (Filed Via Fax on 4/26/06.) 06-08709
04/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on April 4, 2006. (Filed Via Fax on 4/26/06.) 06-09044
06/05/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Appellant's counsel James L. Buchanan II shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. 06-11636
06/16/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-12650
06/16/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-12653
06/16/2006MotionFiled Motion. 06-12654
06/19/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 01/06/06 and 03/16/06. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. Not filed in district court. 06-12769
06/23/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On June 16, 2006, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw as counsel. The motion is granted. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. The district court shall have 30 days to appoint appellate counsel. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain appellate counsel and appellate counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from the date of appointment or appearance the district court clerk shall transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's order appointing appellate counsel. 06-13015
07/03/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-13700
08/24/2006Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on August 18, 2006, appointing Mark Bailus as counsel for appellant. 06-17634
09/14/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Mark Bailus shall have 20 days to file either a supplemental fast track statement or a notice that no supplemental fast track statement will be filed. Should Bailus file a supplemental fast track statement, the State shall have 10 days to file a supplemental fast track response. 06-18936
10/06/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Supplemental Fast Track Statement. 06-20525
10/13/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Rough draft transcript request due: 10 days. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts to file the supplemental fast track statement. 06-21056
10/16/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Supplemental Transcripts requested: 1/5/06 and 1/6/06. Court Reporter: Richard Kangas. 06-21236
11/07/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 01/05/06 and 01/06/06. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. 06-22714
11/27/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Supplemental. Second Request. 06-24178
11/28/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings.
12/07/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Supplemental Fast Track Statement and Supplemental Appendix (third request). 06-25041
12/13/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Supplemental fast track statement due: 10 days. 06-25476
12/18/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 13 pages. 06-25747
12/18/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-25748
12/18/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Supplement to Appendix, Volume 2. 06-25749
12/29/2006MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File a 15 Page Fast Track Response (Supplemental Fast Track Response). 06-26714
01/04/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the 16-page supplemental fast track response received on December 29, 2006. 07-00259
01/04/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-26715
04/05/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP07-WM/MG/MD 07-07641
05/01/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-08375
05/01/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/09/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 3, 2007. 07-08375