judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AARON R. DAVIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0931
Short Caption:AARON R. DAVIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:88-CF-0931Consolidated: 88-CF-1034 , 91-CO-0504
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2737-87Filed Date:07/22/1988

Opening Event Date:07/22/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/22/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/30/1991
Argued/Submitted:03/22/1993
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/21/1994

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAaron R. Davis N
William T. MorrisonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Edward G. BurleyYN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DAVIS, AARON R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MICHAEL DAVIS NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 7/25/90 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 02 TO CONS 88-931 & 88-1034; CNSL NOTE - 03 FOR APLT IN THIS CASE TO FL NOTE - 03 STATE IN 20 AS TO STATUS OF NOTE - 04 PENDG RT; BRFS OF APLTS DUE 40 NOTE - 04 DAYS AFTER COMPLETE RECORD IS NOTE - 05 FL IN THIS CASE. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 CON 88-1034 NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 10/24/90 ORD: GRANTG APLT'S MO NOTE - 07 IN NO. 88-1034 TO STAY APPEAL NOTE - 08 & APPEAL NOS. 88-1034 & 88-931 NOTE - 08 ARE HEREBY STAYD PENDG F/O OF NOTE - 09 THIS CRT; F/O COUNS FOR APLT NOTE - 09 IN NO. 88-1034 TO FL A COPY OF NOTE - 10 TRL CRT MO W/THIS CRT W/IN 10 NOTE - 10 DAYS.
07/22/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/15/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM T. MORRISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS TO SEPTEMBER 9TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 082588 SCHPRD DSA
09/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 090988 SCHPRD DSA
10/20/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(131 PGS/SWAGERTY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 092188 SCHPRD R
05/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (359 PGS RT - BURNS) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (195 PGS RT - HOLLAND) GT PANEL SCDATE 011589 SCHPRD RT
09/18/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (JUDGE KESSLER'S ORDER DATED 8/30/89) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1989RECEIVED CT RPTR FINNERIN CERTIFICATION OF 5/17/88 PROC. (NOT W/JUDGE/ NOT ON CALENDAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IN 88-1034 W/THIS CASE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1990STATEMENT OF CPLT IN RESPONSE TO 7-25-90 ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 081490 SCHPRD STATE
08/10/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DYS FROM DATE OF ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 080190 SCHPRD U
09/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL PENDING DECISION ON HIS MO TO VACATE CONVICTION AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 091990 SCHPRD BA
09/24/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL LODGE BRF IN 88-931; APLE BRF SHALL BE FL W/IN 30 DAYS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 092590 SCHPRD B
10/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (191 PGS. -- WATKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1990RECORD COMPLETED
10/24/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 7 THRU 10 GW PANELRO SCDATE 101790 SCHPRD V
01/10/1991ORDER COUNS FOR APLT IN NO 88-1034 TO FL STMNT W/THIS CRT IN 30 OF STATUS OF PENDG MO. GW PANELRO SCDATE 121190 SCHPRD V
08/26/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-1034 & 91-504 PMB PANEL SCDATE 082691 SCHPRD BA
09/30/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/30/91 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 093091 SCHPRD BE
10/08/1991ORDER APLE MO X TM FL BRF GRNTD TO 10/30/91. NFX. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 100191 SCHPRD GR
10/30/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 103091 SCHPRD BE
10/30/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/02/1992REGULAR CALENDAR
12/28/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION TO POSTPONE/CONTINUE ARGUMENT
12/30/1992ORDER Grant motion of appellant in no. 88-CF-931 to postpone oral argument and these appeals are hereby removed from the regular calendar of Tuesday, January 5, 1993, at 9:30 a.m. The Clerk shall reschedule these appeals as soon as the calendar permits (WHN)
03/17/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF
03/17/1993RECEIVED - reply brief
03/18/1993VOTE SHEET - aplt's motion to late-file reply brief, lodged reply brief
03/22/1993FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/22/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF
03/22/1993RECEIVED aplt's reply brief
03/22/1993ARGUED ST WA SU William T. Morrison, Esq. for appellant (Aaron Davis); Barbara E. Sosnick, Esq. for appellant (Michael Davis); Edward G. Burley, Esq. for appellee.
03/26/1993ORDER granting motion to late-file reply brief in nos. 88-CF-1034 & 91-CO-504. STWASU.
03/26/1993APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF filed in no. 88-CF-1034 & 91-CO-504.
03/30/1993ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEFSTWASU
03/30/1993APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF is filed
06/29/1993AFFIRMED MOJ (ST,WG,SU)
07/13/1993APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EB to 30 days in nos. 88-CF-1034 and 91-CO-504
07/21/1993ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB within 30 days from the date of this order in nos. 88-CF-1034 and 91-CO-504. (RO)
08/20/1993APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EB (15 days)
08/25/1993ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB within 15 days from the date of this order. (RO)
09/07/1993APLT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC
03/11/1994ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC (petition of Michael Davis) (EB) (Judge Farrell is recused from these cases.)
03/21/1994MANDATE ISSUED