judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TUGGLE VS. TUGGLE

Case Information: 34606
Short Caption:TUGGLE VS. TUGGLECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D222710Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/10/1999 / Combs, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/16/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from NV Federal C.U.-check no. 8609759.
08/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07079
08/10/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/27/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 16, 1999. 99-10530
11/30/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 29, 1999. 99-11932
12/02/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 29, 1999. 99-12035
01/10/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 19, 2000. 00-00364
01/28/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-01429
02/09/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-02029
02/25/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. April 6, 1999 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 00-03052
02/25/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-03053
03/08/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service and Mailing of Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 00-03635
04/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court reporter Casper shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the requested transcripts. 00-06366
05/10/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 6, 1999. Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. SEALED. 00-07788
06/21/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 6/19/00. 00-10646
06/21/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. (SEALED). 00-10647
07/11/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-11903
07/14/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Repondent's Motion to Dismiss. 00-12184
07/20/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Returned Unfiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Corrected brief due: 10 days.
07/27/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 7/24/00. 00-13065
08/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On July 11, 2000, respondent filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. On July 14, 2000, appellant filed an opposition to respondent's motion. In light of this court's policy to decide cases on the merits whenever possible, we deny respondent's motion. 00-15227
03/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-04767
03/16/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Southern Nevada Panel. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB
06/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Young, J. and Leavitt, J. Becker, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-09730
07/09/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10312
07/09/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 11, 2001. 01-10312