judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEWIS A. STEWART V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 79-CF-1099
Short Caption:LEWIS A. STEWART V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:79-CF-1099Consolidated: 82-CF-1239
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F907-78Filed Date:10/24/1979

Opening Event Date:10/24/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/21/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/20/1983
Argued/Submitted:08/16/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLewis A. StewartN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STEWART, LEWIS A. UNITED STATES
10/24/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/21/1980FiledRecord Completed
05/20/1983FiledBriefing Completed
08/16/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/26/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition