judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES COWAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0773
Short Caption:JAMES COWAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 88-CF-0446 Consolidated: 88-CF-0573 , 88-CF-0773
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11562-86Filed Date:06/21/1988

Opening Event Date:06/21/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/26/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/14/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/29/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/05/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJames Cowan N
Richard S. Greenlee YN
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Per A. Ramfjord YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COWAN, JAMES AKA WOP UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE 88-446 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 11/22/88 ORD: SS, CONS 88-446, NOTE - 02 88-573 & 88-773; BRFS OF APLTS NOTE - 03 IN 88-446 & 88-773 ARE DUE BY NOTE - 03 12/19/88; BRF OF APLT IN 88- NOTE - 04 573 IS DUE BY 11/30/88. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 CON 88-446 & 88-573 NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 1/25/89 ORD GRT APLT MO FO EXT NOTE - 06 OF TM TO FL BRF TO 1/30/89 & NOTE - 07 GRT APLT EXT IN 88-773 TO NOTE - 07 2/17/89 AND FL BRF OF APLT IN NOTE - 08 88-573 W/IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 1/26/90 ORD: SUA SPONTE THAT NOTE - 09 THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY RESCHD NOTE - 10 FOR ARGUMENT ON THE SUMMARY NOTE - 10 CALENDAR OF 2/14/90 AT 2:00 PM
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/11/29 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GREENLEER FOR - APLT COWAN ATTY 2 - MCEWENL FOR - APLT GORDON ATTY 3 - RUSSELLS FOR - APLT BELTON TRDATE- 89/11/29 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - RAMFJORDP FOR - APPELLEE
06/21/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/05/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE TRANSCRIPT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 071588 SCHPRD DSA
08/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (923 PGS - BURNS) JB PANEL SCDATE 100588 SCHPRD RT
08/31/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (903 PGS/ SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (942-1043 PGS /BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 090288 SCHPRD RT
09/08/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 072488 SCHPRD R
09/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (791 PGS - HART) JB PANEL SCDATE 090388 SCHPRD RT
11/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(12 PGS/ PAVLISH) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 88-573 TO 12/30/88. PANEL SCDATE 113088 SCHPRD BA
12/12/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF IN 88-573 TO 12/30 & APLE CON BRF 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. PB PANELRO SCDATE 120688 SCHPRD V
12/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-30-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BA
12/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-18-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/17/89 (NO OPE) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FILEDS: 6-8 PB PANELRBH SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD Q
02/03/1989ORDER SEE NO. 88-446 FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-10-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 021789 SCHPRD BA
02/22/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S ANSWER IN 88-446 TO ORDER DATED 2/3/89 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1989LETTER SEE NO. 88-446 ACG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/10/89. ANY FUR REQ W/BE DISFAVORED BY THE CT. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD V
03/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 23RD JB PANEL SCDATE 031089 SCHPRD BA
03/15/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-446 JB PANEL SCDATE 031589 SCHPRD BA
03/23/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN 88-573 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-573 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-573 EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 032789 SCHPRD OPE
04/24/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-773 EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD OPE
04/24/1989ORDER GRANT APLTS MOS & LDGD BRS IN 88-573 & 88-773 ARE FILED; FO: APLE CON BR DUE IN 30 DAYS.EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 021789 SCHPRD CHECK
05/19/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/24/89 (NO OPA) MLR PANEL SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD BE
06/12/1989ORDER GRT MOTION BRIEF OF APLE DUE 6/24/89. PB PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-24-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 062489 SCHPRD BE
06/26/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF DUE BY 7/17/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD CHECK
07/14/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/14/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD BE
10/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(25 PGS/RUST) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/29/1989ARGUED PANELFESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1989ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO FILE REPLY BRIEF. GW PANELFESCPY SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD VS
12/08/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1989APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989RECEIVED AUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING OF APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1990ORDER SUA SPONTE THAT THIS APPEAL IS SCHD FOR REARGUMENT ON THURS. JAN. 18 AT 10:30 A.M. SL PANELRO SCDATE 112989 SCHPRD RDEC
01/26/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 9 AND 10 SL PANELFETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990MEMORANDUM ARGUED BEFORE JJ FE/TE/SC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE ADDITIONAL PLEADING RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S ADDITIONAL PLDG. (SUPPLEMENTAL MEMO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/25/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (11 PGS - BREMEN) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(228 PGS/TREMEL) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (427 PGS. -- SALAZAR) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (102-PGS/FARMER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION--CAUSE RM FOR RESENTENCING COWAN PANELFETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE
09/06/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 2629 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 0000 (CC/DS IN PART)
09/20/1990APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1990ORDER THAT APLE W/I 20 DAYS TO FILE RESPONSE TO PET FOR REHEARING SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1990APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING RJG PANEL SCDATE 102290 SCHPRD ANSE
10/25/1990ORDER DENIYNG PETITION FOR REHEARING SL PANELFETESC SCDATE 092190 SCHPRD VS
11/05/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD