judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LYNNODRA L. BEST V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0634
Short Caption:LYNNODRA L. BEST V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 88-CF-0327 Consolidated:88-CF-0634
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7244-87Filed Date:05/18/1988

Opening Event Date:05/18/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:11/14/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/19/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLynnodra L. Best N
John C. Krollman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sharon M. Collins YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BEST, LYNNODRA L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CO-DEF: CHARLES DANZLER & NOTE - 01 ANTHONY A. TATE NOTE - 02 3/23/89 ORD: SS, CONS 88-327 & NOTE - 02 88-634; GRANT MO'S OF APLE & NOTE - 03 CLK TO FL BRF OF APLE IN 88- NOTE - 03 327 & BRF OF APLE IN 88-634 NOTE - 04 DUE BY 4/4/89. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 CON 88-327 NOTE - 05
06/10/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN C. KROLLMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PB PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD DSA
06/30/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (403 PGS RT - RUST) GT PANEL SCDATE 071788 SCHPRD R
09/02/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 45 DAYS (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
09/22/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 10/6/88. PB PANELPY SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD V
10/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 45 DAYS TO NOVEMBER 21ST (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 100688 SCHPRD BA
11/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 1ST JB PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD BA
01/05/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. PB PANELRO SCDATE 121488 SCHPRD V
01/26/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD BA
01/26/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 020289 SCHPRD N
03/02/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 4, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 031489 SCHPRD BE
03/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 4/4/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD CHECK
03/23/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF IN 88-327 DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/5/89 (NO OPA) MLR PANEL SCDATE 040489 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1989ORDER FL REPLY BRF OF APLT IN 88-327 GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO BRF TO 5/5/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 041489 SCHPRD CHECK
04/26/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN 88-327 DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-6-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 050589 SCHPRD BE
05/12/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MXBA AD PANEL SCDATE 051789 SCHPRD OPA
05/30/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD CHECK
11/14/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGTEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGTEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/19/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD