judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EMORY H. DORM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0630
Short Caption:EMORY H. DORM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6714-86Filed Date:05/20/1988

Opening Event Date:05/20/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/04/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/05/1989
Argued/Submitted:05/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/05/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEmory H. Dorm N
Richard T. Moore YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kathleen Brandon YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DORM, EMORY H. UNITED STATES
05/20/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/10/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD T. MOORE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD DSA
07/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (67 PGS RT - BOSTON) GT PANEL SCDATE 071988 SCHPRD R
08/04/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (165 PGS RT - BOSTON) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
10/07/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/10/88 MLR (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD BE
11/09/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 13TH JB PANEL SCDATE 111088 SCHPRD BE
12/07/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 12/13/88. PB PANELRO SCDATE 111288 SCHPRD V
12/16/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME JB PB PANEL SCDATE 121388 SCHPRD BE
12/16/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1988APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD (EXHIBIT #1 ATTACHED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1989FiledBriefing Completed
01/05/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD OPA
02/03/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO TO FL LDG SUPPLE- MENT TO THE RECORD. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 011889 SCHPRD Q
02/03/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (DAILY CASH & TICKET COUNT) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/25/1989MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT (APPELLANT) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO SUBMIT & CASE SUBMITTED W/OUT ARG. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 042689 SCHPRD VS
05/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/18/1989SUBMITTED PANELFEBEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1989AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELFEBEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE 559 A.2d 1317
06/14/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 1262
07/05/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD