judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALBERT A. JONES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0724
Short Caption:ALBERT A. JONES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 88-CF-0632 Consolidated:88-CF-0724
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9890-87Filed Date:06/08/1988

Opening Event Date:06/08/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/19/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/10/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/09/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlbert A. Jones N
Irwin A. Goldberg YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia L. Petty YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JONES, ALBERT A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: DANIEL PHILLIPS NOTE - 01 #88-632 NOTE - 02 CON 88-632 NOTE - 02
06/08/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/28/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) IRWIN GOLDBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 3/3/88 RT FROM CT RPTR GRAYBILL. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD DSA
08/09/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD R
10/19/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/19/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(80 PGS/CARTER) AD PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD RT
11/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS FROM WHEN COUNSEL IS IN RECEIPT OF ALL COMPLETE TRANSCRIPTS (EBP) AD PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD BA
05/01/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(130 PGS/GRAYBILL) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
06/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/27/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD BA
07/21/1989ORDER SS, CONS 88-632 & 88-724;BRF OF APLT IN THIS CASE DUE IN 10 & BE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTR.DS PANELRO SCDATE 071889 SCHPRD X
08/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR AN ADDITIONAL 2 WEEKS RJG PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD BA
08/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/10/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081289 SCHPRD OPE
08/15/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 13TH IN 88-632 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD BA
08/18/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV & BA IS FL; GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/13/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD X
10/10/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/10/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 100989 SCHPRD BE
02/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/14/1990SUBMITTED PANELTESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF APPELLANT'S CONVICTION PANELTESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/09/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD