judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL L. RICH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0723
Short Caption:MICHAEL L. RICH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10118-87Filed Date:06/14/1988

Opening Event Date:06/14/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/21/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael L. Rich N
Terrence M. O'Connor NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RICH, MICHAEL L. UNITED STATES
06/14/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/28/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) TERRENCE M. O'CONNOR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS GT PB PANEL SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD DSA
07/21/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD R
08/11/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
08/31/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELPY SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD V
08/31/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
09/21/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD