judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

OLIVER M. BOLING V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0727
Short Caption:OLIVER M. BOLING V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F204-84Filed Date:06/01/1988

Opening Event Date:06/01/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/05/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/23/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/07/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/02/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOliver M. Boling N
Steven Weinberg NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Elaine J. Mittleman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BOLING, OLIVER M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/14/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF STEVEN WEINBERG & APPT NOTE - 02 ELAINE MITTLEMAN FOR APLT;APLT NOTE - 03 TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 03
01/01/1906 WEINBERGS VACATED 7/14/88.
06/01/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/28/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF STEVEN WEINBERG, COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT MLH PANEL SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD DSA
07/14/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ELAINE MITTLEMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 071388 SCHPRD GG
07/25/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD DSA
08/05/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/05/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD R
08/09/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 19, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD BA
10/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/21/88 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 101988 SCHPRD BA
11/03/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 11/21/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 102588 SCHPRD V
11/21/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD BA
12/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 26, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD BE
12/29/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/26/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD CHECK
01/25/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 16TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 012689 SCHPRD BE
02/14/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1989FiledBriefing Completed
02/23/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S - TO 3/16/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989ORDER REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 031689 SCHPRD OPE
04/03/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD RBA
07/07/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/07/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGNWSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELRGNWSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/02/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1989MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APPELLANT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1989ORDER DENY APLT'S PRO SE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION SL PANELRONWSC SCDATE 101289 SCHPRD VS