judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GELFAND, HUGH JAMES DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 86-CT-0409
Short Caption:GELFAND, HUGH JAMES DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:T8968-85Filed Date:02/21/1986

Opening Event Date:02/21/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/29/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/05/1987
Argued/Submitted:06/17/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
William W. Taylor YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Steven M. SalkyNY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michele GiulianiNY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Susan S. Mcdonald YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GELFAND, HUGH JAMES DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
02/21/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/29/1986FiledRecord Completed
02/05/1987FiledBriefing Completed
06/17/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/10/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition