judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY G. JONES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0696
Short Caption:ANTHONY G. JONES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10733-87Filed Date:06/06/1988

Opening Event Date:06/06/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/15/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/28/1989
Argued/Submitted:10/31/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony G. Jones N
William S. Rhyne YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Gregory E. Jackson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JONES, ANTHONY G. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/10/31 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - RHYNEW FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - JACKSONG FOR - APPELLEE
06/06/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM S. RHYNE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD DSA
08/04/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 080588 SCHPRD R
08/15/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (254 PGS - PIRFO) JB PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
08/16/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(119 PGS /PIRFO) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/16/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD BA
10/13/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT THAT BR IS DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD M
11/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 112288 SCHPRD BA
12/23/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 26, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD BE
12/29/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/26/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD CHECK
01/26/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-24-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 012689 SCHPRD BE
02/23/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-24-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 030789 SCHPRD OPA
03/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-31-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT OR DISPOSITION AS IF APLE'S BRIEF HAD BEEN TIMELY FILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/28/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1989ORDER GRANT MO'S OF APLE & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE FOR CONSID AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. PANELRBH SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD CHECK
09/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 10/31/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 090889 SCHPRD X
10/31/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/31/1989ARGUED PANELBESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/12/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD