judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES HARRIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0720
Short Caption:JAMES HARRIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bail Reform Act
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1056-87Filed Date:06/15/1988

Opening Event Date:06/15/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/12/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/25/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/06/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/31/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Harris N
Steven R. KiershYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
L. Jackson Thomas, IIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARRIS, JAMES UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 07/17/90 ORD: GRANT APLE'S MO NOTE - 01 TO SUPLMT THE REC & CLK OF THE NOTE - 02 SUPERIOR CLK TO TRANSMIT EXB NOTE - 02 12-A & 12-B TO THIS CRT AS A NOTE - 03 SUPLMTAL REC FORTHWITH. NOTE - 03
06/15/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/28/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN R. KIERSH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1988ORDER APLT DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD DSA
07/29/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD DSA
08/18/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD R
09/08/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(111 PGS /HUNT) AD PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD RT
04/12/1989FiledRecord Completed
04/12/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(317 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 020289 SCHPRD RT
04/25/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD BA
05/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL THIRTY(30)DAYS AFTER THE CORRECT RECORD IS FILED IN THIS APPEAL (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD BE
06/27/1989ORDER GRANTING APLE'S MOTION & DIRG CLERK, SUPER CT, TO TRANSMIT REC IN F 1058-87 FORTHWITH. FH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/18/1990ORDER DIRG CLK OF SUPER CT TO TRANS REC IN F-1058-87 FORTHWITH; FO BE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/25/1990RECORD ON APPEAL IN F1058-87 AD PANEL SCDATE 073090 SCHPRD CHECK
07/12/1990RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 THUR 03 GW PANELRO SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD V
07/25/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/25/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 072590 SCHPRD BE
07/30/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (GOV'T EXHIBITS 12A & 12B CASSETTE TAPES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1990ORDER CLK OF SUPER CRT TO TRANSMIT EXHIBITS 12A & 12B TO THIS CRT AS SUPP REC IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1990ORDER 8/6/90 ORD VACATED. DAS PANELBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/06/1990SUBMITTED PANELFESCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELFESCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/31/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD