judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRONE L. LUCKEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0770
Short Caption:TYRONE L. LUCKEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4987-84Filed Date:06/20/1988

Opening Event Date:06/20/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/25/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/31/1989
Argued/Submitted:06/21/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/16/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyrone L. Luckey N
A. Palmer Ifill YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Gregory E. Jackson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LUCKEY, TYRONE L UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/06/21 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - IFILLA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - JACKSONG FOR - APPELLEE
06/20/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/12/1988DESIGNATION OF RECORD MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 063088 SCHPRD DSA
07/12/1988STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1988$50.00 DOCKETING FEE MLH PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD CHECK
08/25/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/25/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED ADD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1988RECORD ON APPEAL ADD PANEL SCDATE 081988 SCHPRD R
10/04/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 100488 SCHPRD BA
11/08/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-8-88 (NO OPPO) AD PB PANEL SCDATE 110888 SCHPRD BE
12/08/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 9, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 120888 SCHPRD BE
12/21/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 1/9/89. PB PANELRO SCDATE 121488 SCHPRD V
01/10/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PB PANEL SCDATE 010989 SCHPRD BE
01/10/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1989FiledBriefing Completed
01/31/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 013189 SCHPRD V
06/21/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/21/1989ARGUED PANELRGNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 562 A.2d 130
07/25/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 1591
08/16/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD