judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DANIEL GODBOLT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0697
Short Caption:DANIEL GODBOLT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13436-87Filed Date:06/07/1988

Opening Event Date:06/07/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/23/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/09/1989
Argued/Submitted:06/19/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
W. Douglas WhamYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Oscar S. Mayers YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GODBOLT, DANIEL UNITED STATES
06/07/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) W. DOUGLAS WHAM, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD DSA
08/04/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD R
08/23/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/23/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/23/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (99 PGS - VAN BREMEN) JB PANEL SCDATE 083088 SCHPRD RT
09/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/07/88 (NO OPE) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD BA
11/04/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 110788 SCHPRD BA
11/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 01-09-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 120988 SCHPRD BE
12/29/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/9/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD OPA
01/10/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/9/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 010989 SCHPRD BE
01/26/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 2/9/89. ANY FURTHER REQ FOR EXT W/BE DISFAVORED. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD V
02/09/1989FiledBriefing Completed
02/09/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 020989 SCHPRD BE
06/19/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/19/1989SUBMITTED PANELTESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD