judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MAURICE D. JENKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0769
Short Caption:MAURICE D. JENKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4462-87Filed Date:06/23/1988

Opening Event Date:06/23/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:12/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMaurice D. Jenkins N
Kenneth H. RosenauYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Celillianne Green YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JENKINS, MAURICE D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/12/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ROSENAUK FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - GREENCE FOR - APPELLEE
07/06/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) KENNETH H. ROSENAU, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS TO AUGUST 17TH JB PB PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD DSA
08/24/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD DSA
08/31/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD R
01/10/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(220 PGS/IRVING) AD PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
02/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR A 30 DAY EXTENSION (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD BA
02/24/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/23/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD V
04/03/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, ON OR BEF 4/13/89, TO FILE BA OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 041389 SCHPRD BA
05/15/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/19/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 051889 SCHPRD BE
06/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/19/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 052989 SCHPRD OPA
06/19/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD BE
10/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1989LETTER GRTG REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD N
12/12/1989ARGUED PANELRGBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD