judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SAMPLER, KEITH RICARDO DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 86-CT-0952
Short Caption:SAMPLER, KEITH RICARDO DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Lead:86-CT-0952Consolidated: 86-CT-1568
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:T11641-85Filed Date:06/13/1986

Opening Event Date:06/13/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/25/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/22/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/14/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/09/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Marvin E. Clemons YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charlotte Brookins-Hudson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SAMPLER, KEITH RICARDO DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 033087 ORD: DENY MO TO DISMISS NOTE - 01 & CLERK OF SUPER CRT TO NOTE - 02 PREPARE & TRANSMIT 10/16/86 NOTE - 02 JUDGMENT TO THIS CRT AS A SUPP NOTE - 03 RECORD FORTHWITH; APLT BRF DUE NOTE - 03 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD IS FILED NOTE - 04 IN THIS COURT. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 12/23/87 ORD: GRANTG MO OF NOTE - 05 APLT TO CONSOL 86-952 AND NOTE - 06 86-1568; BRIEF OF APLT IN NOTE - 06 86-952 DEEMED BRIEF OF APLT IN NOTE - 07 86-1568; CONSOL BRIEF OF APLE NOTE - 07 DUE IN 30 DAYS. NOTE - 08 CON 86-1568 NOTE - 08
06/13/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/20/1986RECORD ON APPEAL JB (NO SLIP SENT - ATTY APPT?) PANEL SCDATE 081286 SCHPRD R
08/26/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARVIN CLEMONS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1986APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/6/86 GG PANEL SCDATE 100686 SCHPRD BA
11/17/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/17/86 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1986RECEIVED APLT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 103086 SCHPRD RBH
04/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD JUDGEMENT AND COMMITMENT/PRO- BATION ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 042987 SCHPRD SR
05/20/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/25/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 062987 SCHPRD BA
08/12/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS CT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 070787 SCHPRD OPE
08/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (42 PGS - LIMATO) JB PANEL SCDATE 091187 SCHPRD RT
08/25/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/25/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BA
11/27/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 86-1568 & ADOPT BRIEF FILED IN THIS APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-07 CWC PANELPY SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD DDW
01/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/22/88 PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 012288 SCHPRD BE
03/22/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/22/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032288 SCHPRD BE
07/14/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/14/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKNWBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELMKNWBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/09/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD