judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MAMDOUCHI, ALA DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 86-CT-0935
Short Caption:MAMDOUCHI, ALA DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:T11697-85Filed Date:06/09/1986

Opening Event Date:06/09/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/25/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/07/1988
Argued/Submitted:10/21/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/14/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Thomas Reed Kennedy YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charlotte Brookins-Hudson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MAMDOUCHI, ALA DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/19/87 ORD: GRANTG APLT'S MO NOTE - 01 FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA NOTE - 02 PAUPERIS; APPOINTG THOMAS NOTE - 02 KENNEDY, ESQ., TO REPRESENT NOTE - 03 APLT HEREIN; NEW COUNSEL TO NOTE - 03 FILE STATEMENT IN 20 DAYS NOTE - 04 INDICATING WHETHER TRANSCRIPT NOTE - 04 WILL BE ORDERED.
06/09/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/09/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/09/1986MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR APMT OF COUNSEL PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1986RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 080886 SCHPRD R
02/19/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS REED KENNEDY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04 CWC PANELPY SCDATE 091287 SCHPRD RBH
03/11/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 2/19/87 COURT ORDER RE: TRANSCRIPT RJG PANEL SCDATE 031187 SCHPRD STATE
08/25/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/25/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (144 PGS - J & J ) PB PANEL SCDATE 081587 SCHPRD RT
10/02/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 2ND JB PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BA
11/05/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 1ST (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD BA
11/13/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/1/87; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD CHECK
12/01/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/8/87 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD BA
12/04/1987ORDER GRANT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF OF APLT TO 12/8/87; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 120387 SCHPRD DAS
12/07/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 120887 SCHPRD BA
01/07/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEB. 12TH MLH (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 011288 SCHPRD BE
02/26/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 8, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 021288 SCHPRD BE
03/14/1988ORDER GRANT APLE MOTION FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 4/8/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 030988 SCHPRD OPA
04/07/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/07/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 040888 SCHPRD BE
10/21/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/21/1988SUBMITTED PANELFETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/14/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD