Case Information: 42792 | |||
Short Caption: | REEKS (JOE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35958 , 53330 , 56704 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - CR0025967 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/13/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/13/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 04-02898 | |
03/08/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's notice of appeal may have been untimely filed. The documents before this court do not indicate whether written notice of entry in compliance with NRS 34.830 was properly served in the instant case. The clerk of the district court shall have 20 days to transmit a copy of the notice of entry or inform this court that notice of entry of the order was not served on appellant. fn3[The deadlines for the filing of documents in this appeal pursuant to NRAP 3C are hereby suspended pending further order of this court.] | 04-04354 | |
03/11/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Notice of Entry of Decision or Order filed in district court on March 10, 2004. | 04-04650 | |
04/13/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. On March 8, 2004, this court entered an order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. On March 11, 2004, the district court clerk filed a coy of the notice of entry of the order. We conclude that we have jurisdiction over this appeal. Counsel for appellant shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file a fast track statement and appendix. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. | 04-06819 | |
05/20/2004 | Other | Other. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Fast Track Statement. Corrected fast track statement due 10 days. | ||
05/20/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 04-09385 | |
06/02/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 04-10116 | |
06/29/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 04-11863 | |
07/02/2004 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed 29, 2004. The clerk shall file the fast track response received on June 29, 2004. | 04-12146 | |
07/02/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 04-11865 | |
11/15/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-20914 | |
12/10/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-21199 | |
12/10/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/15/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 13, 2004. | 04-21199 |