judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT L. BASSIL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0688
Short Caption:ROBERT L. BASSIL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead: 87-CF-0795 Consolidated:88-CF-0688
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F753-87Filed Date:06/02/1988

Opening Event Date:06/02/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/27/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/30/1988
Argued/Submitted:06/07/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/28/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert L. Bassil N
Terrence M. O'Connor YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Su Zann Lamb YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BASSIL, ROBERT L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ERIC F. HEBRON NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 070788 ORDER: SS, CONS 87-795 NOTE - 02 & 88-688; CLK OF SUP CT TO NOTE - 03 PREPARE & TRANSMIT RECORD IN NOTE - 03 88-688 FORTHWITH; FO: CONS BR NOTE - 04 OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFT RECORD NOTE - 04 & RT HAVE BEEN FILED W/THIS CT NOTE - 05 CON 87-795 NOTE - 05
06/02/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) TERRENCE M. O'CONNOR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD DSA
07/07/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 051688 SCHPRD M
07/15/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD R
07/27/1988FiledRecord Completed
07/27/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (80 PGS RT - RONAN) GT PANEL SCDATE 080288 SCHPRD RT
07/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
09/12/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECMBER 1, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/29/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 120188 SCHPRD BE
12/20/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1988FiledBriefing Completed
12/30/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BE; CLK TO SCHED CASE ASAP. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD OPA
01/03/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/07/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING THE JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM SL PANELMKNWGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989SUBMITTED SL PANELMKNWGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/28/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD