judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ISAAC JOSE ALPIZAR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0687
Short Caption:ISAAC JOSE ALPIZAR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6809-81Filed Date:05/31/1988

Opening Event Date:05/31/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/04/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/20/1989
Argued/Submitted:04/02/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/26/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantIsaac Jose Alpizar N
William T. MorrisonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALPIZAR, ISAAC J. UNITED STATES
05/31/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM T. MORRISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS (NO OPE) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD DSA
07/01/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/04/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD R
09/20/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(42 PGS/ WRAY) AD PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD RT
05/30/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(64 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
06/21/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/26/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/25/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 072689 SCHPRD BE
08/14/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/25/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080989 SCHPRD N
08/22/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-21-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 082589 SCHPRD BE
09/08/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/21/89; NFX. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 082389 SCHPRD U
09/20/1989FiledBriefing Completed
09/20/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 092189 SCHPRD BE
04/02/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/02/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/26/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD