judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

REGINALD D. SWITZER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0710
Short Caption:REGINALD D. SWITZER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7968-87Filed Date:06/15/1988

Opening Event Date:06/15/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/20/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/30/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Robert M. Hurley NN
AppellantReginald D. Switzer N
John M. CopacinoNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SWITZER, REGINALD D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 10/20/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 01 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 02 APPMT OF ROBERT M. HURLEY IS NOTE - 02 VACATED & JOHN M. COPACINO IS NOTE - 03 APPTD FOR APLT; BRF OF APLT NOTE - 03 DUE IN 40 DAYS.
01/01/1906 HURLEYRO VACATED 10/20/89
06/15/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/23/1988ORDER APPOINTING ROBERT M. HURLEY AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 070588 SCHPRD DSA
08/18/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (5 PGS - JOYNER) JB PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD R
03/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(12 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 083188 SCHPRD RT
08/29/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(430 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
10/10/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF ROBERT HURLEY FOR APLT TO APT. JOHN M. COPACINO & EXT. BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFT RT RJG PANEL SCDATE 100989 SCHPRD BA
10/20/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/20/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 101789 SCHPRD X
11/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD BA
12/12/1989ORDER APLT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD U
01/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 012290 SCHPRD BA
01/30/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 011790 SCHPRD OPE
03/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (113-PGS/SHELTON) AJ PANEL SCDATE 042090 SCHPRD RT
08/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
08/08/1990ORDER APLT'S MO IS GRANTED & THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 080390 SCHPRD B
08/08/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
08/30/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD