judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JULIO R. GARCIA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0703
Short Caption:JULIO R. GARCIA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1280-87Filed Date:

Opening Event Date:Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:05/09/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/03/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJulio R. Garcia N
Webster T. Knight YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Michael W. Farrell NN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GARCIA, JULIO R. UNITED STATES
06/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF SENTENCE GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANTS REQUEST FOR AN EXPEDITED APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 062488 SCHPRD OPE
06/27/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO EXPEDITED MO- TION MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1988ORDER DENY MO FOR SUMM REVERSAL; APLT ON 10 DAYS TO FL DOCKETNG STATEMENT. ACG PANELFEBE SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD CHECK
07/22/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD DSA
08/19/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (11 PGS RT - IRVING) GT PANEL SCDATE 082488 SCHPRD RT
10/04/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD BA
10/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/4/88 GT PB PANEL SCDATE 110488 SCHPRD BE
11/04/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 111788 SCHPRD V
01/30/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL NUNC PRO TUNC TO 6/17/88. WEBSTER T. KNIGHT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/09/1989SUBMITTED PANELBETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF TRIAL COURT JUDGMENT PANELBETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/03/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD