judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARVIN N. NELSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0699
Short Caption:MARVIN N. NELSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 88-CF-0612 Consolidated:88-CF-0699
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8948-87Filed Date:05/26/1988

Opening Event Date:05/26/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/27/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/29/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/05/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/09/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarvin N. Nelson N
David Rosenthal YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kevin Ohlson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NELSON, MARVIN N. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ALFRIDA LESESNE NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 CON 88-612 NOTE - 02
05/26/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/24/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID ROSENTHAL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 070588 SCHPRD DSA
07/27/1988FiledRecord Completed
07/27/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD R
08/05/1988ORDER SS, CONS 88-612 & 88-699; CONS BR OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT HAS BEEN FILED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (220 PGS - IRVING) (SEE 88-769 FOR RT) JB PANEL SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD RT
02/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF OF APLT IN 88-612 FOR 30 DAY EXTENSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989ORDER THE CONS BR OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD M
07/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (214 PGS. -- RHOADES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1989ORDER CLERK OF SUPR CRT TO TRANSMIT RT (4/21/88 PROCEEDING); APLT BRF DUE 40 DAYS THEREAFTER. AG PANELRO SCDATE 030189 SCHPRD CHECK
09/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF AD (NO OPPO) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/13/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 100589 SCHPRD M
11/13/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD BA
12/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 12, 1990 NO OPPO AJ PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF TO 1/12/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 121489 SCHPRD V
01/12/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-19-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD BE
01/19/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1990FiledBriefing Completed
01/29/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD V
09/05/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/05/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGSTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/09/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD