judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENNETH ROGERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0771
Short Caption:KENNETH ROGERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3157-79Filed Date:06/20/1988

Opening Event Date:06/20/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/30/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/08/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKenneth Rogers N
Robert J. Murphy YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROGERS, KENNETH a/k/a BARRY W. AMOS UNITED STATES
06/20/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/06/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT J. MURPHY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD DSA
08/30/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/30/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED ADD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 081988 SCHPRD R
09/29/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD BA
11/03/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD BE
11/10/1988APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 111588 SCHPRD OPA
07/17/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/17/1989ORDER GRT APLE MOTION & THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED. PB PANELSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
08/08/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD