judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. MURSHED (MAMUN)

Case Information: 34770
Short Caption:STATE VS. MURSHED (MAMUN)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - NONEClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/03/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/03/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal from Grant of Motion to Suppress. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08285
09/08/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 31, 1999. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 99-08465
09/10/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08572
09/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file points and authorities setting forth more fully the basis for the district court's order and addressing the propriety of the appeal and whether there may be a miscarriage of justice if the appeal is not entertained. Rrespondent shall have 10 days thereafter to file opposing points and authorities. Upon receipt of these authorities, the court will determine whether to entertain the appeal. fn1[The deadlines for the filing of documents pursuant to NRAP 3C are suspended until further order of this court]. 99-09409
10/06/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Preliminary Showing of Good Cause. 99-09590
10/12/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Appellants' Points and Authorities. 99-09841
11/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11523
12/09/1999Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 99-12369
12/21/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Pursuant to NRAP 40(d), returned, with letter, Response to Appellant's Petition for Rehearing, to attorney Kenneth McKenna.
01/13/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-00571
01/14/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. 99-09517
01/14/2000Other Other. Returned, unfiled Joint Appendix. 99-09518
01/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-01502
01/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/11/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 7, 2000. 00-01502