judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: JEFFREY E. DETLEFSEN

Case Information: 10-BG-0873
Short Caption:IN RE: JEFFREY E. DETLEFSENClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN223-10Filed Date:07/15/2010

Opening Event Date:07/15/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentJeffrey E. Detlefsen NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/15/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of the State of Oregon accepting the resignation of respondent while disciplinary charges were pending against him. Respondent was administratively suspended by the District of Columbia Bar on October 1, 2008, for failure to pay dues and failing to file the required annual registration statementm and renauns syspended.
07/19/2010LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with documents pertaining to respondent's resignation while disciplinary charges were pending.
08/09/2010ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of the State of Oregon accepting the resignation of respondent from the practice of law while disciplinary charges were pending against him, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia for five years, with his reinstatement conditioned upon a showing of fitness. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the relevant portions of the record of proceeding in the other disciplining court, that statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition fo identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
09/22/2010STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarading reciprocal discipline.
09/23/2010TMC - notice of reciprocal discipline - OTSC - statement of Bar Counsel - proposed order
09/23/2010RECEIVED a copy of a letter from Bar Counsel to respondent re the filing of the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g).
11/04/2010FiledSUSPENSION ORDERED that Jeffrey E. Detlefsen, Esquire is hereby suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia for a period of five years with a fitness requirement. It is FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until such time as he files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (RD,TE,KG)
11/19/2010RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of nofiling by respondent the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.