judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES E. WINSTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0683
Short Caption:JAMES E. WINSTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead:88-CF-0683Consolidated: 88-CF-0684
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6528-82Filed Date:06/01/1988

Opening Event Date:06/01/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/27/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/01/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames E. Winston N
Calvin Steinmetz YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WINSTON, JAMES E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 88-684 NOTE - 01
06/01/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CALVIN STEINMETZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD DSA
07/18/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1988FiledRecord Completed
07/27/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD R
08/01/1988ORDER SS, CON 88-683 & 88-684, APLE BRF TO BE FL 8/22/88. PB PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (APPELLEE) JB PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD BE
11/10/1988AFFIRMED JUDGMENT GRANTING MO FOR SUMM AFFIRMANCE & AFFIRMING JUDGMNT ON APPEAL. ACG PANELNWTE SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD VS
11/10/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
12/01/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD