judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARLOS MANUEL RAMOS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0713
Short Caption:CARLOS MANUEL RAMOS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5868-83Filed Date:06/08/1988

Opening Event Date:06/08/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/30/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/24/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/11/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/15/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarlos Manuel Ramos N
Steven R. KiershYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Joyce J. Bang YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RAMOS, CARLOS MANUEL AKA CARLOS M. CASTRO UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: FRANL SMITH NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/07/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BUCKMANS FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BANGJ FOR - APPELLEE
06/08/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/28/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN R. KIERSH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1988ORDER APLT DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD DSA
07/27/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD DSA
08/30/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/30/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) AD PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD R
11/30/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
01/23/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1989FiledBriefing Completed
02/24/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD BE
03/01/1989MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT (STIPULATED) THAT THE ATTACHED TRANSCRIPT BE MADE PART OF THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989ORDER CLK TO FL 5/19/88 RT AS SUPP REC. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 031789 SCHPRD X
03/23/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD 5/16/88 RT - CODEFENDANT'S POST TRIAL HEARING DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1989ORDER SS, SCHED CASE FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 7/11/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/11/1989ARGUED PANELMKBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 8/8/89 SUPP REC #1 TO DIVISION. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(ORDS OF JUDGE SCOTT DATED 9/7/88 & 7/19/89) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 569 A.2d 158
01/24/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 0144
02/15/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD