judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALBERT GILLIARD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0712
Short Caption:ALBERT GILLIARD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:88-CF-0712Consolidated: 88-CF-1377
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2007-82Filed Date:05/26/1988

Opening Event Date:05/26/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/22/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/08/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/13/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/18/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlbert Gilliard N
Daniel M. Schember NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth A. BreseeYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GILLIARD, ALBERT UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 5/27/88 NOTE - 01 MLH NOTE - 02 11/9/88 ORD: GRT MO OF COURT- NOTE - 02 APPTD CNSL TO WITHDRAW AND THE NOTE - 03 APPTMT OF DANIEL M. SCHEMBER, NOTE - 03 ESQ., IS HEREBY VACATED. FO NOTE - 04 THAT THE MOTIONS OF APLT PRO NOTE - 04 SE ARE GRTD AND THE CLK IS NOTE - 05 DIRTD TO ENTER THE APPR OF NOTE - 05 ALBERT GILLIARD, PRO SE. FO NOTE - 06 THAT THE BRF OF APLT SHALL BE NOTE - 06 FILED W/I 20 DAYS. NOTE - 07 CON 88-1377 NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 4/7/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 08 LV TO FILE EXHIBIT AND THE CLK NOTE - 09 SHALL FILE THE LODGED EXHIBIT NOTE - 09 (APLT'S APPENDIX/EXHIBIT C-2) NOTE - 10 AS A SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD. NOTE - 10
01/01/1904JUDGE - RO AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1906 SCHEMBERD VACATED PER 11/9/88 ORDER
05/26/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/22/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE DOCKET ENTRY STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DANIEL M. SCHEMBER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS TO 7/15/88 - APPELLANT'S MLH PANEL SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD DSA
07/15/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1988RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APLT RE STATUS OF HIS APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT RE LETTER RECVD 7/29/88 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1988RECEIVED NOTICE FROM APPELLANT'S COUN- SEL RE TRIAL CRT ORDER 7/28/88 EXTENDING TIME TO FILE (NOTE 1 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1988LETTER DATED 8/10/88 FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE LETTER FROM COURT DATED 8/4/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD ANS
08/18/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & CLK TO FL DSA; CLK OF SUPER CRT TO TRANS MIT REC. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 072088 SCHPRD OPE
08/22/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/22/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD R
08/25/1988ORDER CLK OF SUPER CRT TO FL 7/28/88 TRL CRT ORD AS SUPP REC FORTH- WITH. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (JUDGE WALTON ORD.7/21/88) AD PANEL SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD SR
09/30/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30-DAYS TO NOVEMBER 3TH JB PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD BA
10/05/1988RECEIVED MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/3/88 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF (DANIEL M. SCHEMBER) AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1988RECEIVED MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, FOR CHANGE OF COUNSEL OR PER- MISSION TO CONTINUE PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1988RECEIVED STATEMENT OF APPELLANT, PRO SE RE COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S (PRO SE) OPPOSI- TION TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1988RECEIVED REPLY TO PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW FROM APLT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 6 SL PANELRO SCDATE 101988 SCHPRD Q
11/14/1988ORDER SS, CONS 88-712 & 88-1377; APLT TO FL DSA IN 88-1377 IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 112988 SCHPRD BA
11/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 15TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 88-1377 RJG PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
12/08/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF, CLK TO FL BRF, APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELRO SCDATE 121488 SCHPRD V
01/23/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL THIRTY (30) DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT HAS BEEN DOCKETED WITH THE COURT GT PANEL SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD BE
02/02/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXT. OF TIME FOR FILING BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 020289 SCHPRD OPA
03/07/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 30 DAYS AFTER RT. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 021089 SCHPRD M
03/09/1989LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE PUR- SUANT TO RULE 28(K) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1989MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT OF APPELLANT TO FOR LEAVE TO FILE ADDITIONAL MATERIAL (EXHIBITS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989RECORD ON APPEAL IN 88-1377 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 8 THRU 10 SL PANELRO SCDATE 032389 SCHPRD Q
04/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD APLT'S APPENDIX/EXHIBIT C-2 SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1989ORDER APLT BRF DUE IN 88-1377 IN 40 DAYS & APLE BRF DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. ACG PANELMK SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD RT
01/09/1990LETTER RE CASE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1990RECEIVED LETTER W/ATTACHMENTS FROM APLT (APLT'S MOTION TO STRIKE APLES BRIEF(?)) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1990LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE- QUESTING STATUS OF CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1990ORDER VACATE THIS CT'S ORDER DTD AUG 4, 1989, AND THE CONSOLIDATED BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS SL PANELRBH SCDATE 040390 SCHPRD Q
08/08/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/08/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 080890 SCHPRD BE
08/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1990APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MO TO STRIKE APLE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 082890 SCHPRD OPE
08/24/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1990ORDER APLT'S MO TO STIKE APPELLEE'S BRF IS DENIED. GW PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/13/1990SUBMITTED PANELSCWGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSGRESC SCDATE 121390 SCHPRD CSUM
12/27/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/18/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD