judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BOOKER T. NICHOLSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0628
Short Caption:BOOKER T. NICHOLSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11545-87Filed Date:05/23/1988

Opening Event Date:05/23/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/28/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/15/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/08/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBooker T. Nicholson N
L. Robert Miller YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Su Zann Lamb YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NICHOLSON, BOOKER T. UNITED STATES
05/23/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/10/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) L. ROBERT MILLER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD DSA
07/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 072288 SCHPRD R
10/28/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(226 PGS/SIMMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
10/31/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD BA
01/04/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/13/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 011389 SCHPRD BE
02/02/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 2/13/89. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 011689 SCHPRD CHECK
02/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/15/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD BE
03/01/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/15/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD OPA
03/15/1989FiledBriefing Completed
03/15/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 031589 SCHPRD BE
07/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/18/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/08/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD